LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB407
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB407
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB407
Compare Versions
SB407 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB407 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB407 Amended September 4, 2009
SB407 Amended August 31, 2009
SB407 Amended July 1, 2009
SB407 Amended May 20, 2009
SB407 Amended April 23, 2009
SB407 Amended April 13, 2009
SB407 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB407 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB407 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB407 Amended September 4, 2009
SB407 Amended August 31, 2009
SB407 Amended July 1, 2009
SB407 Amended May 20, 2009
SB407 Amended April 23, 2009
SB407 Amended April 13, 2009
SB407 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare