|
06/02/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5197.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 5.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on April 22.)
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2732.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 8.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|