LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB408
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB408
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB408
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 26, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 18, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 2, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
January 26, 2010
Compare
Bill
January 13, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 2, 2009
Compare