|
07/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1373.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2175.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Page 2115.) From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 11.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 21.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|