LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB424
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB424
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB424
Compare Versions
SB424 Chaptered July 2, 2009
SB424 Enrolled June 22, 2009
SB424 Amended June 15, 2009
SB424 Amended May 18, 2009
SB424 Amended May 12, 2009
SB424 Amended April 2, 2009
SB424 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB424 Chaptered July 2, 2009
SB424 Enrolled June 22, 2009
SB424 Amended June 15, 2009
SB424 Amended May 18, 2009
SB424 Amended May 12, 2009
SB424 Amended April 2, 2009
SB424 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare