|
02/01/2010
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Set for hearing July 23. Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set for hearing July 20.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Set for hearing July 8. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set for hearing June 25.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Set for hearing June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 708.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|