LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB425
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB425
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB425
Compare Versions
SB425 Amended July 23, 2009
SB425 Amended July 15, 2009
SB425 Amended June 11, 2009
SB425 Amended May 4, 2009
SB425 Amended April 16, 2009
SB425 Amended April 13, 2009
SB425 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB425 Amended July 23, 2009
SB425 Amended July 15, 2009
SB425 Amended June 11, 2009
SB425 Amended May 4, 2009
SB425 Amended April 16, 2009
SB425 Amended April 13, 2009
SB425 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare