|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2387.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2399.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2349.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2756.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1110.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 580.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|