LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB43
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB43
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB43
Compare Versions
SB43 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB43 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB43 Amended August 27, 2009
SB43 Amended July 14, 2009
SB43 Amended June 30, 2009
SB43 Amended May 19, 2009
SB43 Amended April 20, 2009
SB43 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB43 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB43 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB43 Amended August 27, 2009
SB43 Amended July 14, 2009
SB43 Amended June 30, 2009
SB43 Amended May 19, 2009
SB43 Amended April 20, 2009
SB43 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare