|
08/18/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 6010.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2704.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2655.)
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 730.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|