LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB438
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB438
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB438
Compare Versions
SB438 Chaptered August 17, 2010
SB438 Enrolled August 3, 2010
SB438 Amended January 14, 2010
SB438 Amended December 16, 2009
SB438 Amended May 6, 2009
SB438 Amended April 23, 2009
SB438 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB438 Chaptered August 17, 2010
SB438 Enrolled August 3, 2010
SB438 Amended January 14, 2010
SB438 Amended December 16, 2009
SB438 Amended May 6, 2009
SB438 Amended April 23, 2009
SB438 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare