|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2118.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2760.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1095.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 13.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 701.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 479.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 2.)
|
|
|