LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB459
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB459
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB459
Compare Versions
SB459 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB459 Amended July 14, 2009
SB459 Amended June 18, 2009
SB459 Amended May 6, 2009
SB459 Amended April 21, 2009
SB459 Amended April 1, 2009
SB459 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB459 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB459 Amended July 14, 2009
SB459 Amended June 18, 2009
SB459 Amended May 6, 2009
SB459 Amended April 21, 2009
SB459 Amended April 1, 2009
SB459 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare