|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1841.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2450.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 828.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|