BILL NUMBER: SB 469CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 589 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 15, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Aanestad (Coauthors: Senators Cogdill, Cox, and Maldonado) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill, Block, DeVore, and Huffman) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Chapter 10.5 (commencing with Section 1480) to Division 6 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 469, Aanestad. Veterans' cemeteries: fees. Existing law provides for the establishment and operation of certain state-owned and operated veterans' cemeteries. Existing law authorizes honorably discharged veterans and their spouses and children to be interred at these cemeteries, and provides for a fee to be charged for each spouse or child interred at the cemetery, as specified. This bill would authorize the fee for the interment of the spouses and children of honorably discharged veterans in these cemeteries to be waived if the cemetery administrator determines that the families of the spouses or children do not have sufficient means to pay for the costs of interment, and would require any costs for these interments to be paid from nonstate funds. This bill would require the cemetery administrator to seek reimbursements, as specified, and would authorize the cemetery administrator to solicit private donations, to offset any fees lost as a result of this fee waiver. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 10.5 (commencing with Section 1480) is added to Division 6 of the Military and Veterans Code, to read: CHAPTER 10.5. STATE VETERANS CEMETERIES FEE WAIVER 1480. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, the fee for the interment of the spouses or children of eligible veterans in a cemetery operated under this division may be waived if the cemetery administrator determines that the families of the spouses or children do not have sufficient means to pay for the costs of interment. (b) Any costs for the interment of the spouses or children of eligible veterans who received a waiver pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be paid from nonstate funds. (c) The cemetery administrator shall seek reimbursements, if any are available, from federal, county, and other local agencies to offset any fees lost as a result of the waiver authorized pursuant to subdivision (a). (d) The cemetery administrator may solicit private donations to offset any fees lost as a result of the waiver authorized pursuant to subdivision (a).