|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1907.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 2488.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1109.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 807.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|