California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill June 24, 2009
Bill May 12, 2009
Bill March 23, 2009