|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1893.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2612.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2545.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 9323.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 683.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|