LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB481
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB481
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB481
Compare Versions
SB481 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB481 Enrolled August 21, 2009
SB481 Amended July 16, 2009
SB481 Amended June 18, 2009
SB481 Amended June 11, 2009
SB481 Amended May 14, 2009
SB481 Amended April 22, 2009
SB481 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB481 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB481 Enrolled August 21, 2009
SB481 Amended July 16, 2009
SB481 Amended June 18, 2009
SB481 Amended June 11, 2009
SB481 Amended May 14, 2009
SB481 Amended April 22, 2009
SB481 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare