|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6950.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 18.)
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6175.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. On L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 930.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 708.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|