LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB501
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB501
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB501
Compare Versions
SB501 Amended August 20, 2010
SB501 Amended August 13, 2010
SB501 Amended August 12, 2010
SB501 Amended April 20, 2009
SB501 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB501 Amended August 20, 2010
SB501 Amended August 13, 2010
SB501 Amended August 12, 2010
SB501 Amended April 20, 2009
SB501 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare