|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2334.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2708.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2672.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 892.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 701.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 21.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|