LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB510
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB510
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB510
Compare Versions
SB510 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB510 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB510 Amended August 20, 2009
SB510 Amended July 14, 2009
SB510 Amended June 24, 2009
SB510 Amended May 5, 2009
SB510 Amended April 13, 2009
SB510 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB510 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB510 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB510 Amended August 20, 2009
SB510 Amended July 14, 2009
SB510 Amended June 24, 2009
SB510 Amended May 5, 2009
SB510 Amended April 13, 2009
SB510 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare