California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill June 26, 2009
Bill May 18, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009