LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB52
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB52
Compare Versions
SB52 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB52 Enrolled August 18, 2009
SB52 Amended June 26, 2009
SB52 Amended May 18, 2009
SB52 Amended April 22, 2009
SB52 Introduced January 14, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB52 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB52 Enrolled August 18, 2009
SB52 Amended June 26, 2009
SB52 Amended May 18, 2009
SB52 Amended April 22, 2009
SB52 Introduced January 14, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare