|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2215.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 2713.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2674.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 2541.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 24.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 896.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 807.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|