LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB520
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB520
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB520
Compare Versions
SB520 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB520 Amended August 20, 2009
SB520 Amended July 2, 2009
SB520 Amended June 3, 2009
SB520 Amended May 12, 2009
SB520 Amended April 30, 2009
SB520 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB520 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB520 Amended August 20, 2009
SB520 Amended July 2, 2009
SB520 Amended June 3, 2009
SB520 Amended May 12, 2009
SB520 Amended April 30, 2009
SB520 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare