06/15/2009 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1109.) To Assembly. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 948.) | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/04/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 679.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/15/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Coms. on EQ. and REV. & TAX. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |