California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB531 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/29/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 531AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 16, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 42253 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 531, as amended, DeSaulnier. Solid waste: at-store recycling program. Existing law requires an operator of a store, as defined, to establish an at-store recycling program that provides to customers the opportunity to return clean plastic carryout bags to that store. Under existing law, the California Integrated Waste Management Board administers laws related to waste management. Existing law requires that the manufacturer of plastic carryout bags develop educational materials to encourage the reducing, reusing, and recycling of plastic bags and make those materials available to stores required to comply with the program. This bill would require that in developing the educational materials for use on and after July 1, 2011, the manufacturer  to  consult with specified entities. The bill would authorize the board to modify  ,  and require the board to approve those educational materials  by January 1, 2012  . The bill would also set minimum requirements for information to be included in the educational materials, including, but not limited to, information regarding the requirements for compliance with the program, an Internet Web site with a training program for store personnel and customers on implementing the program, and materials and resources for stores for education of consumers at point of sale. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 42253 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 42253. (a) The manufacturer of a plastic carryout bag shall develop educational materials to encourage the reducing, reusing, and recycling of plastic bags and shall make those materials available to stores required to comply with this chapter. (b) In developing the educational materials for use on and after July 1, 2011, the manufacturer shall consult with the board, the League of California Cities, the California State Association of Counties, private and public waste services, and stores. (c) The educational materials may be modified by the board and shall be approved by the board by January 1,  2011   2012  . (d) The educational materials shall include, but are not limited to, the following information: (1) The requirements for compliance with this chapter. (2) Use of reusable bags, including monetary credits to the consumer for the use of reusable bags. (3) Limits on the need for the use of plastic carryout bags and the number of plastic carryout bags. (4) Maximum item count and weight capacity of plastic carryout bags and reusable bags. (5) Estimated costs of the manufacture, use, environmental impacts, and disposal of plastic carryout bags. (6) An Internet Web site with an online training program for store personnel and customers on implementing this chapter. (7) Materials and resources for stores for the education of consumers at the point of sale, including signage and other educational methods.