|
08/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4448.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4437.)
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Set for hearing August 10.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4378.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 5838.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 5806.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3037.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 974.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|