LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB535
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB535
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB535
Compare Versions
SB535 Chaptered August 30, 2010
SB535 Enrolled August 12, 2010
SB535 Amended June 24, 2010
SB535 Amended September 4, 2009
SB535 Amended July 6, 2009
SB535 Amended June 22, 2009
SB535 Amended May 6, 2009
SB535 Amended April 30, 2009
SB535 Amended April 2, 2009
SB535 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB535 Chaptered August 30, 2010
SB535 Enrolled August 12, 2010
SB535 Amended June 24, 2010
SB535 Amended September 4, 2009
SB535 Amended July 6, 2009
SB535 Amended June 22, 2009
SB535 Amended May 6, 2009
SB535 Amended April 30, 2009
SB535 Amended April 2, 2009
SB535 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare