|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2337.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2353.)
|
|
|
|
09/05/2009
|
Set for hearing September 8.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 9.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 885.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 497.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 420.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
01/16/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|