California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 15, 2009
Bill July 6, 2009
Bill June 30, 2009