|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2433.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3341.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Corrected July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1006.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 679.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|