California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB546 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill September 1, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill June 29, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009