California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 15, 2009
Bill May 18, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009