LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB548
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB548
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB548
Compare Versions
SB548 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB548 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB548 Amended July 15, 2009
SB548 Amended May 18, 2009
SB548 Amended April 13, 2009
SB548 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB548 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB548 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB548 Amended July 15, 2009
SB548 Amended May 18, 2009
SB548 Amended April 13, 2009
SB548 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare