|
01/25/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2626.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 3674.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 3639.) Read third time. Amended. (Page 3639.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
11/03/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 1039.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 584.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
01/16/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|