California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB55 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2009

Enrolled

Bill January 7, 2010

Chaptered

Bill January 25, 2010

Amended

Bill December 10, 2009
Bill May 20, 2009
Bill May 13, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009