|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5051.) Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5012.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6674.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on May 28.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4550.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 3302.) Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Hayashi.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 35. Page 2944.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Hayashi.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 2820.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2613.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1186.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 838.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|