LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB550
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB550
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB550
Compare Versions
SB550 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB550 Amended August 20, 2010
SB550 Amended August 16, 2010
SB550 Amended August 2, 2010
SB550 Amended June 30, 2010
SB550 Amended June 21, 2010
SB550 Amended April 8, 2010
SB550 Amended August 31, 2009
SB550 Amended August 17, 2009
SB550 Amended July 9, 2009
SB550 Amended May 20, 2009
SB550 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB550 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB550 Amended August 20, 2010
SB550 Amended August 16, 2010
SB550 Amended August 2, 2010
SB550 Amended June 30, 2010
SB550 Amended June 21, 2010
SB550 Amended April 8, 2010
SB550 Amended August 31, 2009
SB550 Amended August 17, 2009
SB550 Amended July 9, 2009
SB550 Amended May 20, 2009
SB550 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare