California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill June 3, 2010
Bill January 11, 2010
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009