LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB56
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB56
Compare Versions
SB56 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB56 Amended August 17, 2010
SB56 Amended June 3, 2010
SB56 Amended January 11, 2010
SB56 Amended May 5, 2009
SB56 Amended April 2, 2009
SB56 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB56 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB56 Amended August 17, 2010
SB56 Amended June 3, 2010
SB56 Amended January 11, 2010
SB56 Amended May 5, 2009
SB56 Amended April 2, 2009
SB56 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare