|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2282.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2851.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2756.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Corrected July 2.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1007.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 914.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|