California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 27, 2009
Bill June 25, 2009
Bill June 17, 2009
Bill May 14, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009