|
06/30/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1182.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1073.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 639.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|