LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB603
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB603
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB603
Compare Versions
SB603 Amended July 1, 2009
SB603 Amended June 1, 2009
SB603 Amended May 18, 2009
SB603 Amended April 28, 2009
SB603 Amended April 15, 2009
SB603 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB603 Amended July 1, 2009
SB603 Amended June 1, 2009
SB603 Amended May 18, 2009
SB603 Amended April 28, 2009
SB603 Amended April 15, 2009
SB603 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare