|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6292.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on April 7.)
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2706.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2628.)
|
|
|
|
12/16/2009
|
Set for hearing January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|