California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill January 21, 2010
Bill January 12, 2010
Bill December 15, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009