|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 6303.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6233.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 930.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 679.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|